Schulte v. Sunbeam Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Susan Schulte
Defendant: Sunbeam Products, Inc. and Electrical Appliance Group
Case Number: 2:2021cv11861
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Burkhart, Ashley) Modified on 10/1/2021 (SSch). [DOCUMENT IS PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST]
October 1, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Burkhart, Ashley) Modified on 10/1/2021 (SSch). [DOCUMENT IS PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST]
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Litke on behalf of Sunbeam Products, Inc.. (Litke, Tyler)
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Pratheep Sevanthinathan appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sevanthinathan, Pratheep)
August 17, 2021 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Defendant Electrical Appliance Group. (Day, Meigs)
August 17, 2021 NOTICE of Error directed to: Meigs M. Day re #1 Notice of Removal,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (TTho)
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Sunbeam Products, Inc. (Day, Meigs)
August 11, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sunbeam Products, Inc. (Day, Meigs)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sunbeam Products, Inc. (Day, Meigs)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Sunbeam Products, Inc.. (Day, Meigs)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sunbeam Products, Inc. from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2021-188462-NP. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8574167 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Day, Meigs)
August 11, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schulte v. Sunbeam Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Schulte
Represented By: Ashley Burkhart
Represented By: Pratheep Sevanthinathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunbeam Products, Inc.
Represented By: Meigs M. Day
Represented By: Tyler Litke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrical Appliance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?