RPM Freight Systems, LLC v. K1 Express, Inc.
Plaintiff: RPM Freight Systems, LLC
Defendant: K1 Express, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv11964
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Referring Judge: Curtis Ivy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Vacating #6 Order to Show Cause - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by RPM Freight Systems, LLC. (Agosta, Anthony)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for RPM Freight Systems, LLC to Show Cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of federal jurisdiction - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE by RPM Freight Systems, LLC of withdrawal of #3 MOTION for Alternate Service . (Agosta, Anthony)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. K1 Express, Inc. waiver sent on 9/14/2021, answer due 11/15/2021. (Agosta, Anthony)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Alternate Service by RPM Freight Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Process Server) (Agosta, Anthony)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *K1 Express, Inc.* (DPer)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by RPM Freight Systems, LLC against K1 Express, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8588851 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland County, MI - County of 1st Defendant: Middlesex. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - K1 Express Broker Carrier Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Rate Confirmation, #4 Exhibit C - Bill of Lading, #5 Exhibit D - Tesla Demand Letter) (Agosta, Anthony)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RPM Freight Systems, LLC v. K1 Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RPM Freight Systems, LLC
Represented By: Anthony A. Agosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K1 Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?