Singh Management Co., LLC et al
Plaintiff: Singh Management Co., LLC, Singh Homes, LLC, Singh Development, LLC and Singh Construction II, LLC
Defendant: Singh Michigan Homes LLC, Singh Michigan Development Co., Inc., Singh Michigan Building Co., Inc., Singh Michigan Construction LLC and Darshan Grewal
Case Number: 2:2021cv12188
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Referring Judge: Bernard A Friedman
2 Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION for Reconsideration re #30 Preliminary Injunction by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Merriam-Webster Definition of a Proper Noun) (Nayak, Mahesh)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REPLY to Response re #16 MOTION to Dismiss COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) AND/OR 12(b)(1) filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LARA Summaries) (Nayak, Mahesh)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 DECLARATION by Darshan Singh Grewal re #30 Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants (Nayak, Mahesh)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING #11 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' #25 MOTION TO STRIKE AND ADJOURN. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Motion Hearing held on 10/21/2021 re #10 MOTION for Contempt and to Modify Existing Injunction or in the Alternative for A Preliminary Injunction filed by Singh Construction II, LLC, Singh Management Co., LLC, Singh Development, LLC, Singh Homes, LLC, #11 MOTION for Contempt and to Modify Existing Injunction or in the Alternative for a Preliminary Injunction [CORRECTED] filed by Singh Construction II, LLC, Singh Management Co., LLC, Singh Development, LLC, Singh Homes, LLC, #25 MOTION to Strike #22 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Singh Michigan Development Co., Inc., Singh Michigan Construction LLC, Darshan Grewal, Singh Michigan Homes LLC, Singh Michigan Building Co., Inc. Disposition: Motions #10 #11 granted in part; Motion #25 denied. Court to issue order. (Court Reporter: Carol Sapala) (JCur)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RESPONSE to #16 MOTION to Dismiss COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) AND/OR 12(b)(1) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. State Court Order, #2 Exhibit 2. Correspondence between counsel) (Matthews, Richard)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RESPONSE to #25 MOTION to Strike #22 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Matthews, Richard)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jonathan D. Nikkila appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Nikkila, Jonathan)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to Strike #22 Reply to Response to Motion, by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Nayak, Mahesh)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael O. Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Smith, Michael)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John S. Artz appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Artz, John)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPLY to Response re #11 MOTION for Contempt and to Modify Existing Injunction or in the Alternative for a Preliminary Injunction [CORRECTED] filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Second Grewal Decl.) (Matthews, Richard)
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE to #11 MOTION for Contempt and to Modify Existing Injunction or in the Alternative for a Preliminary Injunction [CORRECTED] filed by All Defendants. (Nayak, Mahesh)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Singh Michigan Building Co., Inc. (Nayak, Mahesh)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Singh Michigan Development Co., Inc. (Nayak, Mahesh)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Singh Michigan Construction LLC (Nayak, Mahesh)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Singh Michigan Homes LLC (Nayak, Mahesh)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) AND/OR 12(b)(1) by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - DOCKET CASE NO. 15-CV-11478, #3 Exhibit B - 9/17/2021 EMAIL CORRESPONDENCE, #4 Exhibit C - STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING ARBITRATION) (Nayak, Mahesh)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Mahesh K. Nayak on behalf of All Defendants. (Nayak, Mahesh)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RE-NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCE HEARING on #11 MOTION for Contempt and to Modify Existing Injunction or in the Alternative for a Preliminary Injunction [CORRECTED]. Motion Hearing reset for 10/21/2021 02:00 PM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1610439353?pwd=aEtvejRLNW8xZitKR2xvVS9wY05BZz09 Passcode: 852344 Or One tap mobile : US: +16692545252,,1610439353# or +16692161590,,1610439353#| (JCur)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCE HEARING on #11 MOTION for Contempt and to Modify Existing Injunction or in the Alternative for a Preliminary Injunction [CORRECTED]. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2021 02:00 PM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1610439353?pwd=aEtvejRLNW8xZitKR2xvVS9wY05BZz09 Passcode: 852344 Or One tap mobile : US: +16692545252,,1610439353# or +16692161590,,1610439353#| (JCur)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds to District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (NAhm)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Contempt and to Modify Existing Injunction or in the Alternative for a Preliminary Injunction [CORRECTED] by All Plaintiffs. (Matthews, Richard)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Contempt and to Modify Existing Injunction or in the Alternative for A Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Matthews, Richard)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DPer)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert C. Van Arnam on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Van Arnam, Robert)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Trademark Report Sent To Washington (Matthews, Richard)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Singh Construction II, LLC (Matthews, Richard)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs (Matthews, Richard)[BY SINGH DEVELOPEMENT, LLC] Modified on 9/17/2021 (DPer).
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs (Matthews, Richard)[BY SINGH HOMES, LLC] Modified on 9/17/2021 (DPer).
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs (Matthews, Richard)[BY SINGH MANAGEMENT CO., LLC] Modified on 9/17/2021 (DPer).
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Thomas Matthews on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Matthews, Richard)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8618695 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. USR2247287, #2 Exhibit B. USR5824673, #3 Exhibit C. Pltf's Website, #4 Exhibit D. Def's. Parade of Homes Ad, #5 Exhibit E. Def's. Print Advertisement, #6 Exhibit F. Parade of Homes Website) (Matthews, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh Management Co., LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Singh Management Co., LLC
Represented By: Robert C. Van Arnam
Represented By: Richard Thomas Matthews
Represented By: Michael O. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Singh Homes, LLC
Represented By: Robert C. Van Arnam
Represented By: Richard Thomas Matthews
Represented By: Michael O. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Singh Development, LLC
Represented By: Robert C. Van Arnam
Represented By: Richard Thomas Matthews
Represented By: Michael O. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Singh Construction II, LLC
Represented By: Robert C. Van Arnam
Represented By: Richard Thomas Matthews
Represented By: Michael O. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Singh Michigan Homes LLC
Represented By: John S. Artz
Represented By: Jonathan D. Nikkila
Represented By: Mahesh K. Nayak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Singh Michigan Development Co., Inc.
Represented By: John S. Artz
Represented By: Jonathan D. Nikkila
Represented By: Mahesh K. Nayak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Singh Michigan Building Co., Inc.
Represented By: John S. Artz
Represented By: Jonathan D. Nikkila
Represented By: Mahesh K. Nayak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Singh Michigan Construction LLC
Represented By: John S. Artz
Represented By: Jonathan D. Nikkila
Represented By: Mahesh K. Nayak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darshan Grewal
Represented By: John S. Artz
Represented By: Jonathan D. Nikkila
Represented By: Mahesh K. Nayak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?