United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Shumake, Jr. et al
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Robert Samuel Shumake, Jr., Willard L Jackson, Nicole T Birch, 420 Real Estate, LLC, Vicent aka Vincent Petrescu and TruCrowd, Inc. dba Fundanna
Case Number: 2:2021cv12193
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Anthony P Patti
Referring Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by United States Securities and Exchange Commission of Settlements in Principle with Defendants Birch, Petrescu, and TruCrowd, Inc. (Birkenheier, John)
October 7, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Nicole T Birch waiver sent on 9/22/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (Birkenheier, John)
September 30, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Vicent aka Vincent Petrescu waiver sent on 9/21/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (Birkenheier, John)
September 30, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. TruCrowd, Inc. dba Fundanna waiver sent on 9/21/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (Birkenheier, John)
September 30, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. 420 Real Estate, LLC waiver sent on 9/23/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (Birkenheier, John)
September 29, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Robert Samuel Shumake, Jr. waiver sent on 9/22/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (Birkenheier, John)
September 23, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Willard L Jackson waiver sent on 9/22/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (Birkenheier, John)
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Dante Roldan appearing on behalf of United States Securities and Exchange Commission (Roldan, Dante)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jerrold H Kohn appearing on behalf of United States Securities and Exchange Commission (Kohn, Jerrold)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (SSch)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John E. Birkenheier appearing on behalf of United States Securities and Exchange Commission (Birkenheier, John)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: USA - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Birkenheier, John)
September 20, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SSch)
September 20, 2021 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF Plaintiff requests summons issued. (Birkenheier, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Shumake, Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: John E. Birkenheier
Represented By: Dante Roldan
Represented By: Jerrold H Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Samuel Shumake, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willard L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole T Birch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 420 Real Estate, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicent aka Vincent Petrescu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TruCrowd, Inc. dba Fundanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?