Ultra Manufacturing Limited et al v. Williamston Products, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ultra Manufacturing Limited and Ultra Manufacturing SA de C.V.
Defendant: Williamston Products, Inc., WPI de Mexico, LLC, Michael C. Azar and Jack Fedorchack
Intervenor Defendant: Flagstar Bank
Case Number: 2:2021cv12223
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 38 RESPONSE to #30 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (B)(1) filed by Ultra Manufacturing Limited, Ultra Manufacturing SA de C.V.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4) (Ellis, Nicholas)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Deadline for Response to Motion to Dismiss #30 . (Response due by 11/19/2021) Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
November 4, 2021 Filing 36 COUNTERCLAIM filed by Flagstar Bank against Ultra Manufacturing Limited, Ultra Manufacturing SA de C.V. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Exit Statement) (Raphelson, Jeffrey)
November 4, 2021 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Flagstar Bank. (Raphelson, Jeffrey)
November 4, 2021 Filing 34 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by WPI de Mexico, LLC (Crowder, Elliot)
November 4, 2021 Filing 33 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Williamston Products, Inc. (Crowder, Elliot)
November 4, 2021 Filing 32 COUNTERCLAIM filed by Williamston Products, Inc. against Ultra Manufacturing Limited, Ultra Manufacturing SA de C.V. (Crowder, Elliot)
November 4, 2021 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by WPI de Mexico, LLC, Williamston Products, Inc.. (Crowder, Elliot)
October 22, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (B)(1) by Michael C. Azar, Jack Fedorchack. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A: Declaration of Jack Fedorchak, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B: Declaration of Michael Azar) (Bank, Jason)
October 22, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason W. Bank on behalf of Michael C. Azar, Jack Fedorchack. (Bank, Jason)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Deadline to Respond to Complaint.(Response due by 11/4/2021) Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER Resolving Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Possession Pending Final Judgment, Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief for Specific Performance. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting Flagstar FSB's Emergency Motion to Intervene #16 . Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Pursuant to the Stipulated Order, ECF No. #27 , the hearing scheduled for September 24, 2021 is hereby CANCELLED. Issued by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
September 23, 2021 Minute Entry for telephonic proceedings before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/23/2021. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (EPar)
September 23, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 9/23/2021 at 05:00 PM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
September 23, 2021 Filing 24 EXHIBIT T re #21 Sur-Reply by WPI de Mexico, LLC, Williamston Products, Inc. (Bullock, Charles)
September 23, 2021 Filing 23 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ultra Manufacturing Limited, Ultra Manufacturing SA de C.V.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit 9, #5 Exhibit 10, #6 Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit 12) (Ellis, Nicholas)
September 23, 2021 Filing 22 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re Status Conference,,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Flagstar Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Exit Statement) (Raphelson, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2021 Filing 21 SUR-REPLY re #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by WPI de Mexico, LLC, Williamston Products, Inc.. (Bullock, Charles)
September 23, 2021 Filing 20 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Ultra Manufacturing SA de C.V. (Ellis, Nicholas)
September 23, 2021 Filing 19 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Ultra Manufacturing Limited (Ellis, Nicholas)
September 23, 2021 NOTICE of Error directed to: Nicholas J. Ellis re 4 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, 5 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations. The documents contain fillable fields. Documents must be flattened with no fillable fields. Documents were stricken and must be refiled correctly.. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (TTho)
September 22, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF IN PERSON HEARING on #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2021 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
September 22, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY to Response re #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ultra Manufacturing Limited, Ultra Manufacturing SA de C.V.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 6) (Ellis, Nicholas)
September 22, 2021 Filing 16 Emergency MOTION to Intervene by Flagstar Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Accommodation Agreement) (Raphelson, Jeffrey)
September 22, 2021 Filing 15 EXHIBIT Exhibits H and I re #9 Response to Motion by WPI de Mexico, LLC, Williamston Products, Inc. (Bullock, Charles)
September 22, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Norman C. Ankers on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Ankers, Norman)
September 22, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Simon on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Simon, John)
September 22, 2021 Filing 12 EXHIBIT G re #9 Response to Motion by WPI de Mexico, LLC, Williamston Products, Inc. (Bullock, Charles)
September 22, 2021 Minute Entry for telephonic proceedings before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/22/2021 on Plaintiffs' motion for Temporary Restraining Order. If the parties are not able to resolve the outstanding issues regarding payment for the parts at issue and recovery of the tooling, each party may file a supplemental brief addressing the issues, not to exceed 10 pages, by noon on Thursday, September 23, 2021 . The Court will conduct a hearing on the motion on Friday, September 24, 2021 at 11:00 AM. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (EPar)
September 21, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Initial Response) filed by WPI de Mexico, LLC, Williamston Products, Inc.. (Bullock, Charles)
September 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Elliot G. Crowder on behalf of WPI de Mexico, LLC, Williamston Products, Inc.. (Crowder, Elliot)
September 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles D. Bullock on behalf of WPI de Mexico, LLC, Williamston Products, Inc.. (Bullock, Charles)
September 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Aiello on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Aiello, Mark)
September 21, 2021 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Ultra Manufacturing SA de C.V. (Ellis, Nicholas)
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Ultra Manufacturing Limited (Ellis, Nicholas)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (TTho)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Ultra Manufacturing Limited, Ultra Manufacturing SA de C.V.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4) (Ellis, Nicholas)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ultra Manufacturing Limited, Ultra Manufacturing SA de C.V. against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8623155 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of Country - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Ingham. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H) (Ellis, Nicholas)
September 21, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ultra Manufacturing Limited et al v. Williamston Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ultra Manufacturing Limited
Represented By: Mark A. Aiello
Represented By: Nicholas J. Ellis
Represented By: John A. Simon
Represented By: Norman C. Ankers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ultra Manufacturing SA de C.V.
Represented By: Mark A. Aiello
Represented By: Nicholas J. Ellis
Represented By: John A. Simon
Represented By: Norman C. Ankers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williamston Products, Inc.
Represented By: Charles D. Bullock
Represented By: Elliot G. Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WPI de Mexico, LLC
Represented By: Charles D. Bullock
Represented By: Elliot G. Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael C. Azar
Represented By: Jason W. Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Fedorchack
Represented By: Jason W. Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Flagstar Bank
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Raphelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?