Jillson v. Schwindel et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Jillson
Defendant: Garett Schwindel and SKT2, LLC dba Kagwerks
Case Number: 2:2021cv12276
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Curtis Ivy
Referring Judge: Linda V Parker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 12/9/2021 09:30 AM before District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
November 19, 2021 Filing 10 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Defendants identifying Corporate Parent SKT2, LLC dba Kagwerks for SKT2, LLC dba Kagwerks. (Stern, Mark)
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Stern, Mark)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATED ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS, ( Responsive pleadings due by 11/19/2021). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
October 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy David Lockhart on behalf of All Defendants. (Lockhart, Jeremy)
October 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Stern on behalf of All Defendants. (Stern, Mark)
October 19, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. SKT2, LLC dba Kagwerks served on 10/8/2021, answer due 10/29/2021. (Holtz, Ethan)
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Garett Schwindel served on 10/5/2021, answer due 10/26/2021. (Mayer, Emily)
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Garett Schwindel* (SKra)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *SKT2, LLC dba Kagwerks* (SKra)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kenneth Jillson against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8630768 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland Co., MI - County Where Action Arose: Oakland Co., MI - County of 1st Defendant: Clark Co., WA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-Promissory Note, executed December 2, 2015, #3 Exhibit B-September 2017 Contractual Terms, #4 Exhibit C-E-mail and Spreadsheet from Dames, dated December 22, 2017, #5 Exhibit D-June 4, 2020 Text Message Conversations between Schwindel and Jillson, #6 Exhibit E-June 24, 2020 E-mail from Schwindel to Jillson) (Holtz, Ethan)
September 27, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jillson v. Schwindel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Jillson
Represented By: Ethan R. Holtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garett Schwindel
Represented By: Jeremy David Lockhart
Represented By: Mark A. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SKT2, LLC dba Kagwerks
Represented By: Jeremy David Lockhart
Represented By: Mark A. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?