Alexander v. Wade
Plaintiff: Isaac Alexander
Defendant: Dattahn Jamal Wade
Case Number: 2:2021cv12369
Filed: October 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Filing 8 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
October 25, 2021 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents. (DPer)
October 14, 2021 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge Patti on Isaac Alexander Pris. No. 223690 at Lakeland Correctional Facility, 141 First Street, Coldwater, MI 49036. (LBar)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing service without prepayment of costs and authorizing the US Marshal to collect costs after service is made. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (TTho)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and Directing Payment of an Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $0 and subsequent payments. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (TTho)
October 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Mediation Program (LGra)
October 2, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Isaac Alexander. (LGra)
October 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Isaac Alexander against Jamal Wade (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Civil Cover Sheet) (LGra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dattahn Jamal Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?