Reeb v. Alro Steel Corporation
Plaintiff: Dennis Reeb
Defendant: Alro Steel Corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv12545
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1938
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Alro Steel Corporation waiver sent on 11/17/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Blanchard, David)
November 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Carlson on behalf of Dennis Reeb. (Carlson, Matthew)
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Alro Steel Corporation* (KBro)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Frances J. Hollander on behalf of Dennis Reeb. (Hollander, Frances)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Dennis Reeb against Alro Steel Corporation with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8671726 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Jackson - County of 1st Defendant: Jackson. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redacted Consent Form) (Blanchard, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reeb v. Alro Steel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Reeb
Represented By: Frances J. Hollander
Represented By: David M. Blanchard
Represented By: Matthew Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alro Steel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?