Micha US LLC et al v. Benchmark Healthcare Consultants LLC et al
Plaintiff: Micha US LLC, Monroe MI SNF Management LLC, Adrian MI SNF Management LLC and Hastings MI SNF Management LLC
Defendant: Benchmark Healthcare Consultants LLC, Strawberry Fields Reit, LLC, Gubin Enterprises Limited Partnership, Jeff Sax and Moishe Gubin
Case Number: 2:2021cv12573
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Jonathan JC Grey
Referring Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Jeff Sax waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022. (Low, Benjamin)
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Benchmark Healthcare Consultants LLC waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022. (Low, Benjamin)
November 11, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Moishe Gubin waiver sent on 11/10/2021, answer due 1/10/2022; Gubin Enterprises Limited Partnership waiver sent on 11/10/2021, answer due 1/10/2022; Strawberry Fields Reit, LLC waiver sent on 11/10/2021, answer due 1/10/2022. (Low, Benjamin)
November 4, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Benchmark Healthcare Consultants LLC, Moishe Gubin, Gubin Enterprises Limited Partnership, Jeff Sax, Strawberry Fields Reit, LLC* (LHos)
November 4, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LHos)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III to District Judge George Caram Steeh. (SSch)
November 2, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Benjamin Ming Xing Low appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Low, Benjamin)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8675811 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: out of state - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: out of state. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): USDC, Eastern District of Michigan, 16-cv-14459, Judge George Caram Steeh] (Schwartz, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Micha US LLC et al v. Benchmark Healthcare Consultants LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micha US LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Ming Xing Low
Represented By: Jonathan H. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monroe MI SNF Management LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Ming Xing Low
Represented By: Jonathan H. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian MI SNF Management LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Ming Xing Low
Represented By: Jonathan H. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hastings MI SNF Management LLC
Represented By: Jonathan H. Schwartz
Represented By: Benjamin Ming Xing Low
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benchmark Healthcare Consultants LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strawberry Fields Reit, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gubin Enterprises Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Sax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moishe Gubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?