AIG Insurance Company of Canada v. Consulting Integrity International, LLC.
Plaintiff: AIG Insurance Company of Canada
Defendant: Consulting Integrity International, Inc. and Consulting Integrity International, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv12931
Filed: December 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Curtis Ivy
Referring Judge: David M Lawson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to Extend Time to Answer or Respond to #1 Complaint. Answer or Response due by 2/17/2022. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
January 26, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/14/2022 at 2:00 PM before District Judge David M. Lawson. See image for document deadline. (SPin)
January 25, 2022 Filing 10 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Consulting Integrity International, LLC (Goss, Maxwell)
January 25, 2022 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND ANSWER DEADLINE by Consulting Integrity International, LLC (Goss, Maxwell)
January 25, 2022 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Maxwell J. Goss appearing on behalf of Consulting Integrity International, LLC (Goss, Maxwell)
January 13, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Consulting Integrity International, LLC served on 1/6/2022, answer due 1/27/2022. (Musbach, Katherine)
December 21, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *Consulting Integrity International, LLC* (DPer)
December 21, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by AIG Insurance Company of Canada against Consulting Integrity International, LLC. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Musbach, Katherine)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for AIG Insurance Company of Canada to Show Cause why Case Should Not be Dismissed. Show Cause Response due by 1/6/2022. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
December 16, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by AIG Insurance Company of Canada identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Canada Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent AIG International Holdings GmbH, Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty International, LLC for AIG Insurance Company of Canada. (Musbach, Katherine)
December 16, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Consulting Integrity International, Inc.* (SKra)
December 16, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
December 16, 2021 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Consulting Integrity International, LLC. (Musbach, Katherine)
December 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by AIG Insurance Company of Canada against Consulting Integrity International, Inc.. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8725243 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of Country - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Musbach, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AIG Insurance Company of Canada v. Consulting Integrity International, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIG Insurance Company of Canada
Represented By: Katherine Musbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consulting Integrity International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consulting Integrity International, LLC
Represented By: Maxwell J. Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?