Miles v. Wayne County et al
Plaintiff: Calvin Anthony Miles
Defendant: Wayne County, Ecolab, Inc., Summit Food Service LLC, CBM Managed Services, OfficerGuard WedLow, Officer/Guard Cohen, Officer/Guard Davis, Officer/Guard Nicholson and Officer/Guard Hall
Case Number: 2:2021cv13003
Filed: December 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Curtis Ivy
2 Judge: David M Lawson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Leigh Pfeifer on behalf of Ecolab, Inc.. (Pfeifer, Douglas)
February 17, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT WAYNE COUNTY by Wayne County. (Stella, Davidde)
February 15, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Wayne County served on 1/5/2022, answer due 1/26/2022. (Robinson, David)
January 31, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Summit Food Service LLC. (Sabatini Plastiras, Juliana)
January 26, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. Favaro on behalf of Ecolab, Inc.. (Favaro, Elizabeth)
January 26, 2022 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Juliana B. Sabatini Plastiras appearing on behalf of Summit Food Service LLC (Sabatini Plastiras, Juliana)
January 25, 2022 Filing 11 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Ecolab, Inc. (Beyer, Matthew)
January 25, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Ecolab, Inc.. (Beyer, Matthew)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Interim Status Conference set for 3/1/2022 at 2:00 PM; Discovery due by 7/15/2022; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 8/2/2022; Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/12/2023 at 2:00 PM; Jury Trial set for 5/2/2023 at 8:30 AM before District Judge David M. Lawson. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (Refer to image for additional dates) (SPin)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER consolidating cases for discovery and extending dates. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (TTho)
January 19, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Summit Food Service LLC served on 1/10/2022, answer due 1/31/2022. (Robinson, David)
January 19, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. CBM Managed Services served on 1/13/2022, answer due 2/3/2022. (Robinson, David)
January 19, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ecolab, Inc. served on 1/10/2022, answer due 1/31/2022. (Robinson, David)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Terrence G. Berg to District Judge David M. Lawson. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (SSch)
December 27, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *CBM Managed Services, Officer/Guard Cohen, Officer/Guard Davis, Ecolab, Inc., Officer/Guard Hall, Officer/Guard Nicholson, Summit Food Service LLC, Wayne County, OfficerGuard WedLow* (SKra)
December 24, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Kuhn on behalf of Calvin Anthony Miles. (Kuhn, Thomas)
December 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Calvin Miles filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8734018 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Eastern District of Michigan, 21-11533, Judge David M. Lawson] (Robinson, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miles v. Wayne County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Anthony Miles
Represented By: Thomas E. Kuhn
Represented By: David A. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne County
Represented By: Davidde A. Stella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecolab, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Leigh Pfeifer
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Favaro
Represented By: Matthew Beyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Food Service LLC
Represented By: Juliana B. Sabatini Plastiras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBM Managed Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OfficerGuard WedLow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer/Guard Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer/Guard Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer/Guard Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer/Guard Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?