Millan v. FBI et al
Plaintiff: Rodrigo De Souza Millan
Defendant: FBI and FAA
Case Number: 2:2022cv10006
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Jonathan JC Grey
Referring Judge: David M Lawson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of summons by Rodrigo De Souza Millan. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Document Continuation, #3 Document Continuation) (DPer)
February 3, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Rodrigo De Souza Millan. (DPer)
January 27, 2022 Filing 5 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
January 18, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Summons and #1 Complaint by Rodrigo De Souza Millan upon the FBI, FAA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Document Continuation, #3 Document Continuation) (DPer)
January 3, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *FAA, FBI, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General* (DPer)
January 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Rodrigo De Souza Millan against defendants; Receipt No: 40094 - Fee: $ 402. (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Millan v. FBI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodrigo De Souza Millan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?