Stahl et al v. Auto Bright Auto Sales, LLC
Plaintiff: Donna Stahl and Andrew Stahl
Defendant: Auto Bright Auto Sales, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv10125
Filed: January 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Linda V Parker
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Fraud-Motor Vehicle (Odometer)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Auto Bright Auto Sales, LLC by Donna Stahl, Andrew Stahl. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A Application for Title, #3 Exhibit B Certified Title History, #4 Exhibit C Affidavit of Donna Stahl, #5 Exhibit D Affidavit of Counsel) (Taub, Adam)
February 24, 2022 Filing 5 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Auto Bright Auto Sales, LLC* (LGra)
February 23, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Auto Bright Auto Sales, LLC by Donna Stahl, Andrew Stahl. (Taub, Adam)
February 3, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Auto Bright Auto Sales, LLC served on 1/25/2022, answer due 2/15/2022. (Taub, Adam)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Auto Bright Auto Sales, LLC* (LHos)
January 21, 2022 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LHos)
January 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Donna Stahl, Andrew Stahl against Auto Bright Auto Sales, LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8762707 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Taub, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stahl et al v. Auto Bright Auto Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Stahl
Represented By: Adam G. Taub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Stahl
Represented By: Adam G. Taub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Bright Auto Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?