Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. et al v. S_R Jubilee, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. and LC Trademarks, Inc.
Defendant: S_R Jubilee, LLC, Saleem Jassani and Rashada Jassani
Case Number: 2:2022cv10246
Filed: February 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Saylor, Larry)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Plaintiff(s) to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute: Show Cause Response due by 3/25/2022. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
February 25, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. S_R Jubilee, LLC served on 2/17/2022, answer due 3/10/2022. (Saylor, Larry)
February 23, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Saleem Jassani served on 2/20/2022, answer due 3/14/2022. (Saylor, Larry)
February 23, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Rashada Jassani served on 2/20/2022, answer due 3/14/2022. (Saylor, Larry)
February 9, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued for *S_R Jubilee, LLC* (DAll)
February 9, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *Saleem Jassani* (DAll)
February 9, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Rashada Jassani* (DAll)
February 8, 2022 Filing 4 Trademark Report Sent To Washington (Saylor, Larry)
February 8, 2022 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by LC Trademarks, Inc. (Saylor, Larry)
February 8, 2022 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. (Saylor, Larry)
February 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8784340 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Saylor, Larry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. et al v. S_R Jubilee, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Larry J. Saylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LC Trademarks, Inc.
Represented By: Larry J. Saylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S_R Jubilee, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saleem Jassani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rashada Jassani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?