Johnson v. NFL Player Disability, Neurocognitive & Death Benefit Plan et al
Plaintiff: Kelley Johnson
Defendant: NFL Player Disability, Neurocognitive & Death Benefit Plan, NFL Player Disability and Neurocognitive Benefit Board, The Detroit Lions, Inc., National Football League Management Council and National Football League Players Association
Case Number: 2:2022cv10327
Filed: February 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Referring Judge: Curtis Ivy
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Levasseur on behalf of The Detroit Lions, Inc.. (Levasseur, Dennis)
May 13, 2022 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ashley E. Racette appearing on behalf of National Football League Players Association (Racette, Ashley)
May 12, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Lee Junk on behalf of NFL Player Disability and Neurocognitive Benefit Board, NFL Player Disability, Neurocognitive & Death Benefit Plan. (Junk, Michael)
May 12, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Shaun Gates on behalf of NFL Player Disability and Neurocognitive Benefit Board, NFL Player Disability, Neurocognitive & Death Benefit Plan. (Gates, Shaun)
May 11, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Altman on behalf of NFL Player Disability and Neurocognitive Benefit Board, NFL Player Disability, Neurocognitive & Death Benefit Plan. (Altman, William)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time of Responsive Pleadings and Setting Schedule for Briefing on Motions to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan)
May 3, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Fred K. Herrmann on behalf of National Football League Players Association. (Herrmann, Fred)
April 25, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, by Kelley Johnson (Cotton, Daimeon)
April 20, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, by Kelley Johnson (Cotton, Daimeon)
April 20, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, by Kelley Johnson (Cotton, Daimeon)
April 20, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, by Kelley Johnson (Cotton, Daimeon)
April 20, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, by Kelley Johnson (Cotton, Daimeon)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Regarding Filings. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan)
February 16, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *NFL Player Disability and Neurocognitive Benefit Board, NFL Player Disability, Neurocognitive & Death Benefit Plan, National Football League Management Council, National Football League Players Association, The Detroit Lions, Inc. * (LHos)
February 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kelley Johnson against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8797429 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. B cont'd) (Cotton, Daimeon)
February 16, 2022 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LHos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. NFL Player Disability, Neurocognitive & Death Benefit Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelley Johnson
Represented By: Daimeon Cotton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFL Player Disability, Neurocognitive & Death Benefit Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFL Player Disability and Neurocognitive Benefit Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Detroit Lions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Football League Management Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Football League Players Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?