United States of America v. Elias et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Sydney Elias, William Elias, Sydney Wroblewski, Jamie Ayoub, Hilda Zarou and Wayne County Treasurer
Case Number: 2:2022cv10544
Filed: March 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Referring Judge: Jonathan JC Grey
2 Judge: Matthew F Leitman
3 Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 3001 Federal Debt Collection
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters Full Pretrial to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
May 10, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. William Elias served on 5/6/2022, answer due 5/27/2022. (JOwe)
May 5, 2022 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents. (TTho)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Complete Service Documents and for Service of Process by the US Marshal - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #8 Motion for Order (See document #9 for image) - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
April 25, 2022 Filing 8 Ex Parte MOTION for Order Requiring Service of Summons by United States Marshals Service on Defendant William Elias by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-March 16, 2022 Email from Marshall Goldberg, Esq.) (Schneider, Peter)
April 22, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued for *William Elias* (DAll)
April 22, 2022 REQUEST for SUMMONS for William Elias. (Schneider, Peter)
March 25, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by United States of America as to Wayne County Treasurer (Schneider, Peter)
March 25, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Jamie Ayoub waiver sent on 3/23/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Schneider, Peter)
March 25, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Sydney Elias waiver sent on 3/23/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Schneider, Peter)
March 18, 2022 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Hilda Zarou waiver sent on 3/15/2022, answer due 5/16/2022. (Schneider, Peter)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Matthew F. Leitman and Magistrate Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey to District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (SSch)
March 16, 2022 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
March 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America against All Defendants. No summons requested. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: Wayne Co., MI - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne Co., MI. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-October 10, 2018 Plea Agreement Excerpts., #3 Exhibit B-July 19, 2017 Consent Judgment of Divorce., #4 Exhibit C-February 6, 2019 Quitclaim Deed of Deer Pines to Sydney Elias., #5 Exhibit D-February 7, 2019 Order Amending Judgment of Divorce., #6 Exhibit E-February 7, 2019 Order Granting Lien Securing Outstanding Child Support., #7 Exhibit F-February 11 2019 Quitclaim Deed of Deer Pines to Jamie Ayoub., #8 Exhibit G-March 1, 2019 Certificate of Forfeiture., #9 Exhibit H-January 7, 2020 Certificate of Redemption., #10 Exhibit I-2019 and 2020 Tax Assessments Information for Deer Pines., #11 Exhibit J-August 6, 2021 Emails Between United States and Elias., #12 Exhibit K-August 7, 2021 Quitclaim Deed of Deer Pines Back to Elias., #13 Exhibit L-August 7, 2021 Quitclaim Deed of Deer Pines to Zarou., #14 Exhibit M-United States Motion for Restraining Order dated August 10, 2021., #15 Exhibit N-August 22, 2021 Restraining Order., #16 Exhibit O-October 7, 2021 Amended Restraining Order.) (Schneider, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Elias et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sydney Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sydney Wroblewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Ayoub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilda Zarou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne County Treasurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Peter F. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?