Kelly v. Corizon Health Inc. et al
Plaintiff: william Kelly
Defendant: Corizon Health Inc., Quality Correctional Care of Michigan, P.C., joshua kocha, leila ghasemi, PA Danielle S. Alford, Ravi D. Yarid, Richard A Bohjanen and Todd K. Bostwick
Case Number: 2:2022cv10589
Filed: March 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Terrence G Berg
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/16/2023, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 2/15/2023. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (Refer to image for additional dates) (AChu)
May 16, 2022 Minute Entry for telephonic proceedings before District Judge Terrence G. Berg: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 5/16/2022 (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (AChu)
May 15, 2022 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #14 MOTION for Sanctions for Violation of a Stipulated Protective Order filed by william Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint in Jackson v. Corizon Health, filed 1-3-20, #2 Exhibit Email from Plaintiff's counsel to Corizon's counsel, April 5, 2021, #3 Exhibit Supplemental Response to Corizon Defendants RTP 14, #4 Exhibit Excerpt from Statement of Work Contract Activities --Michigan 2020, #5 Exhibit Excerpt from Maryland 2017 Proposal, #6 Exhibit Excerpt from Kansas 2013 Proposal, #7 Exhibit Excerpt from Tennessee 2012 Proposal, #8 Exhibit Excerpt from Indiana 2021 Proposal, #9 Exhibit Dep. of Robert Lacy in Spiller v. Stieve, #10 Exhibit Dep. of Dr. Keith Papendick in Wright v. Corizon Health, #11 Exhibit Dep. of Dr. Keith Papendick in Lashuay, #12 Exhibit Dep. of Dr. Albert Maier in Hoffer v. Jones, #13 Exhibit Introduction to Utilization Management, #14 Exhibit Definition of Medically Necessary Care, #15 Exhibit Michigan DOC and Quality Care of Michigan, PC Specialty Consult (407) Standard Operating Procedure, #16 Exhibit Corizon internal documents filed in Lashuay, Nov. 2019, #17 Exhibit Corizon Provider Info Manual Chapter 3, #18 Exhibit Corizon Provider Info Manual Chapter 5, #19 Exhibit Corizon Provider Info Manual Chapter 8, #20 Exhibit Corizon Health Policy & Procedure -- Authorization for Outpatient Referrals -- All States, #21 Exhibit Corizon Nursing Within the Walls manual, #22 Exhibit Dep. of Dr. Bergman filed in Jackson v. Corizon Health on Feb 5 2020) (Cross, Ian)
May 11, 2022 Filing 15 SEALED EXHIBIT D re #14 MOTION for Sanctions for Violation of a Stipulated Protective Order by Corizon Health Inc.. (Pillow, Nicholas)
May 11, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Sanctions for Violation of a Stipulated Protective Order by Corizon Health Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Case Caption for Kohchise Jackson v. Corizon Health, Inc., et al, Case No: 2:19-cv-13382, #2 Exhibit B- ECF No. 44 Stipulated Protective Order for Kohchise Jackson v. Corizon Health, Inc., et al, Case No: 2:19-cv-13382, #3 Exhibit C- Corizon Defendants Responses to Plaintiffs First Requests for Production for Kohchise Jackson v. Corizon Health, Inc., et al, Case No: 2:19-cv-13382, dated November 13, 2020, #4 Exhibit D- Corizon Health, Inc.s 2017 Utilization Management Manual (to be filed under seal)) (Pillow, Nicholas)
May 11, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Seal Exhibit D to Defendant Corizon's Motion for Sanctions by Corizon Health Inc.. (Pillow, Nicholas)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
May 5, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Todd K. Bostwick. (Dwaihy, Paul)
May 4, 2022 Filing 10 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Pillow, Nicholas)
May 4, 2022 Filing 9 STIPULATION QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Todd K. Bostwick (Dwaihy, Paul)
April 21, 2022 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Paul J. Dwaihy appearing on behalf of Todd K. Bostwick (Dwaihy, Paul)
April 18, 2022 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Laurence H Margolis appearing on behalf of william Kelly (Margolis, Laurence)
April 18, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/16/2022 10:00 AM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg (AChu)
April 13, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Danielle S. Alford, Richard A Bohjanen, Corizon Health Inc., Quality Correctional Care of Michigan, P.C., Ravi D. Yarid, leila ghasemi, joshua kocha. (Lanesky, Jonathan)
April 13, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Nicholas Pillow appearing on behalf of Danielle S. Alford, Richard A Bohjanen, Corizon Health Inc., Quality Correctional Care of Michigan, P.C., Ravi D. Yarid, leila ghasemi, joshua kocha (Pillow, Nicholas)
April 7, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jonathan C. Lanesky appearing on behalf of Danielle S. Alford, Richard A Bohjanen, Corizon Health Inc., Quality Correctional Care of Michigan, P.C., Ravi D. Yarid, leila ghasemi, joshua kocha (Lanesky, Jonathan)
March 21, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
March 21, 2022 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
March 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by william Kelly against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8839370 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Saginaw - County Where Action Arose: Jackson - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Washtenaw County Circuit Court, 21-001120-PZ, Judge Carol Kuhnke] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Ex. E) (Cross, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Corizon Health Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: william Kelly
Represented By: Ian T. Cross
Represented By: Laurence H Margolis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan C. Lanesky
Represented By: Nicholas Pillow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Correctional Care of Michigan, P.C.
Represented By: Jonathan C. Lanesky
Represented By: Nicholas Pillow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: joshua kocha
Represented By: Jonathan C. Lanesky
Represented By: Nicholas Pillow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: leila ghasemi
Represented By: Jonathan C. Lanesky
Represented By: Nicholas Pillow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PA Danielle S. Alford
Represented By: Jonathan C. Lanesky
Represented By: Nicholas Pillow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ravi D. Yarid
Represented By: Jonathan C. Lanesky
Represented By: Nicholas Pillow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A Bohjanen
Represented By: Jonathan C. Lanesky
Represented By: Nicholas Pillow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd K. Bostwick
Represented By: Paul J. Dwaihy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?