Scramoge Technology Limited v. Volkswagen AG et al
Plaintiff: Scramoge Technology Limited
Defendant: Volkswagen AG and Volkswagen Group of America, Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv10730
Filed: April 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A Drain
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant Volkwagen AG to Respond to #1 Complaint, (Response due by 6/13/2022) Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
May 31, 2022 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gerald F. Ivey appearing on behalf of Volkswagen Group of America, Inc (Ivey, Gerald)
May 31, 2022 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Daniel Jordan appearing on behalf of Volkswagen Group of America, Inc (Jordan, Daniel)
May 31, 2022 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Luke Hampton MacDonald appearing on behalf of Volkswagen Group of America, Inc (MacDonald, Luke)
May 31, 2022 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Matthew Berntsen appearing on behalf of Volkswagen Group of America, Inc (Berntsen, Matthew)
May 31, 2022 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Elliot Cook appearing on behalf of Volkswagen Group of America, Inc (Cook, Elliot)
May 12, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Volkswagen AG served on 5/11/2022, answer due 6/1/2022. (Dobrowitsky, Catherine)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting in part #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. Answer to #1 Complaint due by 6/13/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (MLan)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti: #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
May 6, 2022 Filing 11 REPLY to Response re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit D - Stipulation to Extend Time, Case No. 21-cv-08035 (C.D. Cal, Dec. 1, 2021), #3 Exhibit E- Stipulation and Order for Extension of Time, Case No. 21-cv-001673 (C.D. Cal, Oct 25, 2021), #4 Exhibit F - Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, Case No. 21-cv-00579 (W.D. Tex, June 14, 2021), #5 Exhibit G- Notice of Agreed Extension of Time, Case No. 21-cv-01138 (W.D. Tex., Nov. 29, 2021), #6 Exhibit H - Email Correspondence 5.3.22) (McKnight, Megan)
April 29, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, filed by Scramoge Technology Limited. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - April 26, 2022 Emails, #3 Exhibit 2 - Southfield Educ. Assn v Southfield Bd. of Education, No. 12-cv-11030, Dkt. No. 15-1 (E.D. Mich. Apr. 9, 2013) (J. Drain), #4 Exhibit 3 - Barachkov v. Lucido, No. 04-CV-73957, 2015 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 148953 (E.D. Mich. Nov. 3, 2015) (J. Borman)) (Dobrowitsky, Catherine)
April 27, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Email Correspondence Between Counsel, #3 Exhibit B - Case Law - FieldTurf v AstroTurf LLC, #4 Exhibit C - Case Law - Southfield Education Ass'n v Southfield Bd. of Educ) (McKnight, Megan)
April 26, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Drew B Hollander on behalf of Scramoge Technology Limited. (Hollander, Drew)
April 26, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett E Cooper on behalf of Scramoge Technology Limited. (Cooper, Brett)
April 21, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc served on 4/8/2022, answer due 4/29/2022. (Dobrowitsky, Catherine)
April 6, 2022 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Scramoge Technology Limited (Dobrowitsky, Catherine)
April 6, 2022 Filing 4 Patent Report Sent To Washington (Dobrowitsky, Catherine)
April 6, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Volkswagen Group of America, Inc* (DAll)
April 6, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Volkswagen AG* (DAll)
April 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Scramoge Technology Limited against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8862910 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of Country - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 10546685, #3 Exhibit B - US10,546,685 vs Volkswagen Antenna Booster, #4 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 10,193,392, #5 Exhibit D - US10,193,392 vs Volkswagen Antenna Booster, #6 Exhibit E - U.S. Patent No 7,825,537, #7 Exhibit F - US7,825,537 vs Volkswagen Antenna Booster) (Dobrowitsky, Catherine) Modified on 4/6/2022 (DAll).
April 6, 2022 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scramoge Technology Limited v. Volkswagen AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scramoge Technology Limited
Represented By: Catherine T. Dobrowitsky
Represented By: Brett E Cooper
Represented By: Drew B Hollander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc
Represented By: Daniel Jordan
Represented By: Elliot Cook
Represented By: Gerald F. Ivey
Represented By: Luke Hampton MacDonald
Represented By: Matthew Berntsen
Represented By: Megan Piper McKnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?