Wheeler v. Bayer Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Khari Wheeler
Defendant: Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare LLC and Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv10784
Filed: April 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Victoria A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Khari Wheeler as to Bayer Corporation and Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Klinger, Gary)
June 6, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Andrew Soukup, #3 Exhibit Alka-Seltzer Plus Maximum Strength Sinus Congestion & Pain Drug Facts, #4 Exhibit National Library of Medicine, Dextromethorphan: Medline Plus Drug Information, #5 Exhibit Mayo Clinic, Dextromethorphan (Oral Route), #6 Exhibit Pfizer, Safety Data Sheet (Feb. 2018), #7 Exhibit Dextromethorphan Hydrobromide, Material Safety Data Sheet, #8 Exhibit What Over-the-Counter OTC medications can I take and still be safe to fly?, #9 Exhibit Dramamine Ingredient List, #10 Exhibit Duronio v. Merck & Co., #11 Exhibit Eckler v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., #12 Exhibit Fuller v. Exxon Mobile, M.C., #13 Exhibit Rosenbaum v. Toyota Motor Sales, USA, Inc., #14 Exhibit Samberg v. Detroit Water & Sewer Co., #15 Exhibit Short v. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #16 Exhibit Smith v. Glenmark Generics, Inc., #17 Exhibit Toback v. GNC Holdings, Inc., #18 Exhibit Trees v. Pfizer, Inc.) (Soukup, Andrew)
June 6, 2022 Filing 17 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Petkis, Stephen)
June 6, 2022 Filing 16 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Bayer Healthcare LLC identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Bayer Healthcare LLC. (Petkis, Stephen)
June 6, 2022 Filing 15 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Bayer Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Bayer Corporation. (Petkis, Stephen)
June 6, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Rodgers on behalf of Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Rodgers, Megan)
June 6, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony A. Agosta on behalf of Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Agosta, Anthony)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED ORDER Concerning Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
May 12, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Petkis on behalf of Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Petkis, Stephen)
May 6, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Soukup on behalf of Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Soukup, Andrew)
May 6, 2022 NOTICE of Error directed to: Andrew J. Soukup re #9 Notice of Appearance. Other The document contains fillable fields. Document must be flattened with no fillable fields. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly.. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (DAll)
May 5, 2022 Filing 9 [STRICKEN]NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Soukup on behalf of Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Soukup, Andrew) Modified on 5/6/2022 (DAll).
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Striking #7 Stipulation and Proposed Order filed by Khari Wheeler. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
May 5, 2022 Filing 7 [STRICKEN] STIPULATION and Proposed Order Concerning Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss by Khari Wheeler (Suciu, Nick) .
April 19, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary M. Klinger on behalf of Khari Wheeler. (Klinger, Gary)
April 18, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. served on 4/14/2022, answer due 5/5/2022. (Suciu, Nick)
April 18, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Bayer Healthcare LLC served on 4/14/2022, answer due 5/5/2022. (Suciu, Nick)
April 18, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Bayer Corporation served on 4/14/2022, answer due 5/5/2022. (Suciu, Nick)
April 13, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
April 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Khari Wheeler against Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Fee Required - Fee Not Paid. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Allegheny County, PA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Suciu, Nick)
April 13, 2022 FILING FEE Received in the amount of $402 by Khari Wheeler - Receipt No. AMIEDC-8871285 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SSch)
April 13, 2022 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler v. Bayer Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khari Wheeler
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Represented By: Nick Suciu, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Represented By: Andrew J. Soukup
Represented By: Anthony A. Agosta
Represented By: Megan Rodgers
Represented By: Stephen Petkis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. Soukup
Represented By: Anthony A. Agosta
Represented By: Megan Rodgers
Represented By: Stephen Petkis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Andrew J. Soukup
Represented By: Anthony A. Agosta
Represented By: Megan Rodgers
Represented By: Stephen Petkis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?