DTE Electric Company et al v. Toshiba American Energy Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: DTE Electric Company and Consumers Energy Company
Defendant: Toshiba American Energy Systems Corporation and Toshiba Corporation
Case Number: 2:2022cv10847
Filed: April 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul D Borman
Referring Judge: Jonathan JC Grey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Elin Park on behalf of Consumers Energy Company, DTE Electric Company. (Park, Elin)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Nicholas J. Ellis appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Ellis, Nicholas)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Toshiba Corporation waiver sent on 4/25/2022, answer due 6/24/2022. (Linkous, Derek)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Toshiba American Energy Systems Corporation waiver sent on 4/25/2022, answer due 6/24/2022. (Linkous, Derek)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Weiss on behalf of Consumers Energy Company, DTE Electric Company. (Weiss, Daniel)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Tompkins on behalf of Consumers Energy Company, DTE Electric Company. (Tompkins, Christopher)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Terri L. Mascherin on behalf of Consumers Energy Company, DTE Electric Company. (Mascherin, Terri)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by All Plaintiffs (Linkous, Derek)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *Toshiba Corporation* (LGra)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Toshiba American Energy Systems Corporation* (LGra)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Cheryl A. Bush on behalf of Consumers Energy Company, DTE Electric Company. (Bush, Cheryl)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by DTE Electric Company (Linkous, Derek)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Consumers Energy Company (Linkous, Derek)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by DTE Electric Company, Consumers Energy Company against Toshiba American Energy Systems Corporation, Toshiba Corporation. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8881802 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Jackson - County Where Action Arose: Mason - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Engineering, Procurement & Construction Contract, #2 Exhibit B - Assignment, #3 Exhibit C - Parent Guaranty) (Linkous, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DTE Electric Company et al v. Toshiba American Energy Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DTE Electric Company
Represented By: Cheryl A. Bush
Represented By: Derek J. Linkous
Represented By: Daniel Weiss
Represented By: Christopher Tompkins
Represented By: Elin Park
Represented By: Terri L. Mascherin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consumers Energy Company
Represented By: Cheryl A. Bush
Represented By: Derek J. Linkous
Represented By: Christopher Tompkins
Represented By: Daniel Weiss
Represented By: Elin Park
Represented By: Terri L. Mascherin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba American Energy Systems Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas J. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas J. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?