Montes v. Come-N-Get It Auto Sales, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Leslie Montes
Defendant: Come-N-Get It Auto Sales, Inc. and Ali-Aqil Al-Hassan
Case Number: 2:2022cv10902
Filed: April 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Curtis Ivy
Referring Judge: Victoria A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Fraud-Motor Vehicle (Odometer)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by Leslie Montes of Settlement (Taub, Adam)
May 20, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Come-N-Get It Auto Sales, Inc. served on 5/17/2022, answer due 6/7/2022. (Taub, Adam)
April 27, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Come-N-Get It Auto Sales, Inc.* (NAhm)
April 27, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Ali-Aqil Al-Hassan* (NAhm)
April 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Leslie Montes against Ali-Aqil Al-Hassan, Come-N-Get It Auto Sales, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8890178 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Taub, Adam)
April 27, 2022 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montes v. Come-N-Get It Auto Sales, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Montes
Represented By: Adam G. Taub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Come-N-Get It Auto Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali-Aqil Al-Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?