Mullendore v. Cook Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Amy Mullendore
Defendant: Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Group Incorporated and Cook Medical, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv11116
Filed: May 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Referring Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2022 Case transferred from Michigan Eastern has been opened in Southern District of Indiana as case 1:22-cv-06823, filed 06/14/2022. (VLun)
June 14, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Transfer to the Southern District of Indian for MDL 2570 (SSch)
June 14, 2022 Filing 4 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-207) to Southern District of Indiana for MDL # 2570. (SSch)
June 14, 2022 Filing 3 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-207) for MDL # 2570. [Informational Copy] (SSch)
June 14, 2022 Case transferred to Southern District of Indiana. (SSch)
May 24, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (SSch)
May 24, 2022 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SSch)
May 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Amy Mullendore against Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8920397 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Genesee - County Where Action Arose: Genesee - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): US District Court Southern District of Indiana, 1:14-ml-2570; MDL2570, Judge Richard L. Young] (Thompson, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mullendore v. Cook Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Mullendore
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?