Trainor v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Zenaida Trainor
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv11310
Filed: June 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without Prejudice, Finding as Moot #4 MOTION to Dismiss, (Closing Documents due by 8/26/2022). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to #4 MOTION to Dismiss or File an Amended Complaint, (Response due by 7/22/2022). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
June 17, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Montreal Convention, #3 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3 - Nastych v. Brit. Airways PLC, 2010 WL 363400 (S.D.N.Y. Feb. 2, 2010), #5 Exhibit 4 - Garrisi v. Nw. Airlines, Inc., 2010 WL 3702374 (E.D. Mich. Sept. 16, 2010), #6 Exhibit 5 - Convention for the Unification of Certain Rules for International Carriage by Air Done at Montreal on 28 May 1999 (excerpted), #7 Exhibit 6 - Matz v. Nw. Airlines, Inc., 2010 WL 2064800 (E.D. Mich. May 13, 2008), #8 Exhibit 7 - Yahya v. Yemenia-Yemen Airways, 2009 WL 2711955 (E.D. Mich. Aug. 25, 2009)) (Torpey, Scott)
June 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek D. McLeod on behalf of Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (McLeod, Derek)
June 14, 2022 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Torpey, Scott)
June 13, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Delta Air Lines, Inc. from 12th Judicial District Court for Jackson County, case number 22-0722-GCG. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8944770 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Montreal Convention, #4 Exhibit C - Convention for the Unification of Certain Rules for International Carriage by Air Done at Montreal on 28 May 1999 (excerpted), #5 Exhibit D - Weiss v. El Al Israel Airlines, Ltd., 433 F. Supp. 2d 361 (S.D.N.Y. 2006), #6 Exhibit E - Matz v. Northwest Airlines, 2008 WL 2064800 (E.D. Mich. May 13, 2008), #7 Exhibit F - Garrisi v. Northwest Airlines, Inc., 2010 WL 34702374 (E.D. Mich. Sept. 16, 2010), #8 Exhibit G - Knowlton v. American Airlines, Inc., 2007 WL 273794 (D. Md. Jan. 31, 2007)) (Torpey, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trainor v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zenaida Trainor
Represented By: Tonie M. Franzese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Scott R. Torpey
Represented By: Derek D. McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?