Neo Wireless, LLC v. American Honda Motor Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Neo Wireless, LLC
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co Inc and Honda Development & Manufacturing of America, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv11403
Filed: June 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE to Attorneys re: MDL Docket No. 3034 (SSch)
June 27, 2022 Filing 2 Docket Sheet from Ohio Southern; Case Number 2:22-cv-01824.
June 27, 2022 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the Southern District of Ohio. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (SSch)
June 23, 2022 Case transferred to District of USDC of Eastern District of Michigan.Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (pb) [Transferred from ohsd on 6/27/2022.]
March 29, 2022 Filing 1 TRANSFERRED COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda Development & Manufacturing of America, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8797047), filed by Neo Wireless, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-US8467366, #2 Exhibit 2-US10833908, #3 Exhibit 3-US10075941, #4 Exhibit 4-US10447450, #5 Exhibit 5-US10965512, #6 Exhibit 6-US10771302, #7 Exhibit 7-'366 Claim 1, #8 Exhibit 8-'908 Claim 11, #9 Exhibit 9-'941 Claim 13, #10 Exhibit 10-'450 Claim 7, #11 Exhibit 11-'512 Claim 15, #12 Exhibit 12-'302 Claim 23, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Summons Form American Honda Motor Co., Inc., #15 Summons Form Honda Development & Manufacturing) (Wernow, Howard) (Attachment 13 replaced on 3/30/2022) (daf). [Transferred from OHSD; Case Number 2:22cv-01824]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neo Wireless, LLC v. American Honda Motor Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neo Wireless, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co Inc
Represented By: James A. Wilson
Represented By: John T. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda Development & Manufacturing of America, LLC
Represented By: James A. Wilson
Represented By: John T. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?