Jones v. Palushaj Food Group, Inc
Plaintiff: Sharina Jones
Defendant: Palushaj Food Group, Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv11743
Filed: July 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Jonathan JC Grey
Referring Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and ORDER Setting Aside #7 Clerks Entry of Default, (Response due by 9/30/2022). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
September 1, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Young on behalf of Palushaj Food Group, Inc. (Young, Douglas)
August 23, 2022 Filing 7 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Palushaj Food Group, Inc* (KBro)
August 23, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Palushaj Food Group, Inc by Sharina Jones. (Monismith, Pete)
August 23, 2022 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Sharina Jones. (Monismith, Pete)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Plaintiff to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute: Show Cause Response due by 9/1/2022. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
August 5, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Palushaj Food Group, Inc served on 7/31/2022, answer due 8/22/2022. (Monismith, Pete)
July 27, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Palushaj Food Group, Inc* (LGra)
July 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sharina Jones against Palushaj Food Group, Inc. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8994965 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Monismith, Pete)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Palushaj Food Group, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharina Jones
Represented By: Pete M. Monismith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palushaj Food Group, Inc
Represented By: Douglas Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?