Chiolero v. Redskin Auto Sales And RV Center Inc
Plaintiff: Christopher Chiolero
Defendant: Redskin Auto Sales And RV Center Inc, Betten-Friendly Motors Company and Jim Riehl's Friendly Chrysler Jeep, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv11825
Filed: August 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Fraud-Motor Vehicle (Odometer)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Redskin Auto Sales And RV Center Inc. (Urbani, Anthony)
October 4, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Redskin Auto Sales And RV Center Inc. (Urbani, Anthony)
October 4, 2022 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Christopher Chiolero against Redskin Auto Sales And RV Center Inc, Jim Riehl's Friendly Chrysler Jeep, Inc.. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Taub, Adam)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATED ORDER for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
October 4, 2022 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Jim Riehl's Friendly Chrysler Jeep, Inc.. (Taub, Adam)
September 28, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Christopher Chiolero as to Betten-Friendly Motors Company without prejudice (Taub, Adam)
September 21, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued for *Betten-Friendly Motors Company* (LGra)
September 21, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Christopher Chiolero against Redskin Auto Sales And RV Center Inc, Betten-Friendly Motors Company. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Taub, Adam)
September 21, 2022 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Betten-Friendly Motors Company. (Taub, Adam)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Attend Telephonic Scheduling Conference and Notice of Requirements for Submission of Discovery Plan. (TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 10/25/2022 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR IMPORTANT DEADLINE AND CALL-IN INFORMATION**) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
September 12, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Redskin Auto Sales And RV Center Inc. (Urbani, Anthony)
August 16, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Redskin Auto Sales And RV Center Inc served on 8/16/2002, answer due 9/6/2002. (Taub, Adam)
August 8, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Redskin Auto Sales And RV Center Inc* (SKra)
August 8, 2022 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
August 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Christopher Chiolero against Redskin Auto Sales And RV Center Inc with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9008264 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Taub, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chiolero v. Redskin Auto Sales And RV Center Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Chiolero
Represented By: Adam G. Taub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redskin Auto Sales And RV Center Inc
Represented By: Anthony Urbani, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betten-Friendly Motors Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Riehl's Friendly Chrysler Jeep, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?