AHMED v. MAYORKAS et al
Plaintiff: MOHAMED MOHIELDEEN ABD AHMED
Defendant: Alejandro N Mayorkas, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services and U.S Department of Justice
Case Number: 2:2022cv12015
Filed: August 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul D Borman
Referring Judge: Jonathan JC Grey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2022 Filing 7 [DOCUMENT IS RESPONSE, NOT REPLY] REPLY to Response re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MOHAMED MOHIELDEEN ABD AHMED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B) (Piston, Michael) Modified on 10/18/2022 (DTof).
September 26, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - 9/28/21 Decision, #3 Exhibit - Appendix of Unpublished Cases) (Khangura, Priya)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading. Response due by 9/26/2022 Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
August 31, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Priya Kanwalgul Khangura on behalf of All Defendants. (Khangura, Priya)
August 26, 2022 Filing 3 Docket Sheet from District of Columbia; Case Number 1:21-cv-03209.
August 26, 2022 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the District of Columbia. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (VLun)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER. Upon consideration of the 8 Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Hearing and Withdrawal of Opposition to Defendants Motion to Transfer, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the 8 Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Hearing and Withdrawal of Opposition to Defendants Motion to Transfer is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan. It is further ORDERED that the motions hearing scheduled for August 30, 2022, is VACATED. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall forthwith TERMINATE all remaining deadlines in this case and TRANSFER the case file to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan. It is further ORDERED that this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 15, 2022. (lcrbw3) [Transferred from dcd on 8/26/2022.]
August 26, 2022 Filing 1 TRANSFERREDCOMPLAINT against ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, USCIS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8914694) filed by MOHAMED MOHIELDEEN ABD AHMED. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Piston, Michael) [Transferred from District of Columbia; Case Number 1:21-cv-03209.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AHMED v. MAYORKAS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMED MOHIELDEEN ABD AHMED
Represented By: Michael E. Piston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro N Mayorkas
Represented By: Priya Kanwalgul Khangura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Priya Kanwalgul Khangura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S Department of Justice
Represented By: Priya Kanwalgul Khangura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?