Indepth Engineering Solutions LLC et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Plaintiff: INDEPTH ENGINEERING SOLUTIONS, L.L.C, SHAHZAN IQBAL KHAJA and Indepth Engineering Solutions LLC
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 2:2022cv12139
Filed: September 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Referring Judge: Curtis Ivy
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (1) Dismissing Case Without Prejudice and (2) Denying as Moot Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. #8 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan)
November 3, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Indepth Engineering Solutions LLC, Shahzan Iqbal Khaja (Piston, Michael)
October 22, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Indepth Engineering Solutions LLC, Shahzan Iqbal Khaja. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Michael E. Piston, #2 Exhibit Declaration of S. Khaja, #3 Text of Proposed Injunction) (Piston, Michael)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENT (Dkt. 6). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan)
September 30, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Newby on behalf of All Defendants. (Newby, Jennifer)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Regarding Filings. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan)
September 9, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (TTho)
September 9, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *United States Citizenship and Immigration Services* (TTho)
September 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9048482 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit-Redacted, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon-Atty General, #4 Summon-Office of Chief Counsel, #5 Summon-USCIS) (Piston, Michael)
September 9, 2022 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Indepth Engineering Solutions LLC et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDEPTH ENGINEERING SOLUTIONS, L.L.C
Represented By: Michael E. Piston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAHZAN IQBAL KHAJA
Represented By: Michael E. Piston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indepth Engineering Solutions LLC
Represented By: Michael E. Piston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Jennifer L. Newby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?