Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for the registered holders of J.P. Morgan Chase Commercial Mortgage Securities Corp., Multifamily Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2018-SB5 v. Chi Five Holdings LLC
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for the registered holders of J.P. Morgan Chase Commercial Mortgage Securities Corp., Multifamily Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2018-SB5
Defendant: Chi Five Holdings LLC
Receiver: Tarantino Properties, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv12163
Filed: September 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A Drain
Referring Judge: Linda V Parker
2 Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Chi Five Holdings LLC waiver sent on 9/14/2022, answer due 11/14/2022. (Uetz, Ann Marie)
September 16, 2022 Filing 11 Receiver's BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00 posted by Tarantino Properties, Inc. (Uetz, Ann Marie)
September 15, 2022 Filing 10 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for the registered holders of J.P. Morgan Chase Commercial Mortgage Securities Corp., Multifamily Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2018-SB5 identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for the registered holders of J.P. Morgan Chase Commercial Mortgage Securities Corp., Multifamily Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2018-SB5. (Uetz, Ann Marie)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AGREED ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER AND OTHER RELIEF. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
September 15, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 9/15/2022 11:45 AM before District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
September 15, 2022 Minute Entry for telephonic proceedings before District Judge Linda V. Parker: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/15/2022. Counsel for both parties were present and counsel for Defendant indicated that Defendant consents to the relief requested in Plaintiff's #5 Motion to Appoint Receiver and for Preliminary Relief. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (AFla)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER of RECUSAL and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Gershwin A. Drain to District Judge Linda V. Parker. (SSch) (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/15/2022) (SSch).
September 14, 2022 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John W. Polderman appearing on behalf of Chi Five Holdings LLC (Polderman, John)
September 13, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Receiver and for Preliminary Relief (Uncontested) by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for the registered holders of J.P. Morgan Chase Commercial Mortgage Securities Corp., Multifamily Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2018-SB5. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Fed. Nat'l Mortg. Assoc. v. Maple Creek Gardens, LLC, #3 Exhibit 2 - Receiverships in the Real Estate Setting, #4 Exhibit 3 - Tarantino Properties and Salvatore Anthony Thomas Information, #5 Exhibit 4 - Proposed Agreed Order) (Uetz, Ann Marie)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Robert H. Cleland and Magistrate Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey in Port Huron to District Judge Gershwin A. Drain and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford in Detroit. (SSch)
September 13, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew T. McClain appearing on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for the registered holders of J.P. Morgan Chase Commercial Mortgage Securities Corp., Multifamily Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2018-SB5 (McClain, Andrew)
September 13, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Chi Five Holdings LLC* (DPer)
September 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for the registered holders of J.P. Morgan Chase Commercial Mortgage Securities Corp., Multifamily Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2018-SB5 against Chi Five Holdings LLC. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9051598 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): U.S. District Court Eastern District of Michigan, 22-11783, Judge Gershwin Drain] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Verification, #3 Exhibit B - Legal Description, #4 Exhibit C - Loan Agreement, #5 Exhibit D - Mortgage, #6 Exhibit E - UCC Financing Statements, #7 Exhibit F - Assignments to Plaintiff, #8 Exhibit G - Notice of Default) (Uetz, Ann Marie)
September 13, 2022 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for the registered holders of J.P. Morgan Chase Commercial Mortgage Securities Corp., Multifamily Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2018-SB5 v. Chi Five Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for the registered holders of J.P. Morgan Chase Commercial Mortgage Securities Corp., Multifamily Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2018-SB5
Represented By: Ann Marie Uetz
Represented By: Andrew T. McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Five Holdings LLC
Represented By: John W. Polderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Tarantino Properties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?