Schneider v. University Physician Group
Plaintiff: Kevin Schneider
Defendant: University Physician Group d/b/a Wayne State Health, Wayne State University Physician Group, University Physician Group, Wayne State University Physician Group Doing business as Wayne Health and University Physician Group d/b/a Wayne Health
Case Number: 2:2022cv12601
Filed: October 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Paul D Borman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATED ORDER to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice and Without Attorneys' Fees or Costs. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (KSan)
August 21, 2023 Filing 17 AMENDED PRELIMINARY TRIAL WITNESS LIST by University Physician Group (Roebuck, Marlo)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATED ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURES. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO FACILITATIVE MEDIATION PURSUANT TO E.D. MICH. L. R. 16.4. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
March 20, 2023 Filing 14 WITNESS LIST by Kevin Schneider (Wilson, Scott)
March 20, 2023 Filing 13 WITNESS LIST by University Physician Group (Roebuck, Marlo)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: FACILITATION INFORMATION DUE 5/22/2023; Fact Discovery due by 6/20/2023; Expert Discovery due by 7/28/2023; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 9/29/2023 - Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (Refer to image for additional dates) (DTof)
January 20, 2023 Filing 11 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Nacht, David)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATED ORDER to correct case caption to reflect defendant's proper name. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (TTho)
January 3, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Damon Wilson on behalf of Kevin Schneider. (Wilson, Scott)
December 28, 2022 Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by University Physician Group (Wu, Benjamin)
December 28, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Wu on behalf of University Physician Group. (Wu, Benjamin)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO MEET AND TO FILE JOINT RULE 26 PLAN Discovery plan due by 1/20/2023 Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
December 22, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by University Physician Group. (Roebuck, Marlo)
December 14, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Complaint,, by Kevin Schneider (Nacht, David)
October 31, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Wayne State University Physician Group* (TTho)
October 31, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *University Physician Group d/b/a Wayne State Health* (TTho)
October 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kevin Schneider against University Physician Group d/b/a Wayne State Health, Wayne State University Physician Group with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9110526 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Washtenaw - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Oakland County Circuit Court, 2022-192884-CD, Judge Kwame L.] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- EEOC Notice of Rights) (Nacht, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schneider v. University Physician Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Schneider
Represented By: David A. Nacht
Represented By: Scott Damon Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Physician Group d/b/a Wayne State Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne State University Physician Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Physician Group
Represented By: Marlo J. Roebuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne State University Physician Group Doing business as Wayne Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Physician Group d/b/a Wayne Health
Represented By: Benjamin Wu
Represented By: Marlo J. Roebuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?