Grayson v. Social Security, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Javaar T Grayson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Social Security, Commissioner of
Case Number: 2:2022cv12818
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of Social Security, Commissioner of served on 12/6/2022, answer due 2/6/2023. (Spencer, Kerry)
December 5, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Ridgell-Boltz on behalf of Social Security, Commissioner of. (Ridgell-Boltz, Laura)
November 29, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Commissioner of Social Security* (SSch)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Clerk to issue summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (MarW)
November 22, 2022 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
November 21, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Javaar T Grayson. (Spencer, Kerry)
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Javaar T Grayson against Commissioner of Social Security. Plaintiff requests summons issued. IFP Application to Follow. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Defendant U.S. Government - County of 1st Defendant: U.S. Government. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Spencer, Kerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grayson v. Social Security, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javaar T Grayson
Represented By: Kerry J Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security, Commissioner of
Represented By: Laura Ridgell-Boltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?