Parker v. Michigan Department of Corrections State Prison et al
Plaintiff: Michael C. Parker
Defendant: Michigan Department of Corrections State Prison, Macomb Correctional Facility Correctional Officers, Brown, Priest, Stemen and Platz
Case Number: 2:2022cv12891
Filed: November 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Referring Judge: Curtis Ivy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Limited Appearance by Austin C. Raines on behalf of Brown, Michigan Department of Corrections State Prison, Platz, Priest, Stemen for the purposes of the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program. (Raines, Austin)
January 20, 2023 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Michael C. Parker re #6 Order Staying Case (SKra)
January 10, 2023 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Michael C. Parker re #5 Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (SSch)
January 6, 2023 Filing 8 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (LBar)
January 6, 2023 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #8 Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes, #6 Order Staying Case on Michael C. Parker Pris. No. 210492 at Macomb Correctional Facility, 34625 26 Mile Road, New Haven, MI 48048. (LBar)
January 4, 2023 Filing 7 COPY of #4 Order mailed to Michael C. Parker and returned as undeliverable (DPer)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER STAYING CASE and Referral to the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
January 3, 2023 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Order Staying Case on Michael C. Parker Pris. No. 210492 at Macomb County Jail, P.O. Box 2308, Mt. Clemens, MI 48043. (LBar)
December 19, 2022 Filing 5 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and Directing Payment of an Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $51.82 and subsequent payments. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (SKra)
November 29, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Mediation Program (TTho)
November 29, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Michael C. Parker. (TTho)
November 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Michael C. Parker against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet) (TTho)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Michigan Department of Corrections State Prison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael C. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Department of Corrections State Prison
Represented By: Austin C. Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macomb Correctional Facility Correctional Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown
Represented By: Austin C. Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priest
Represented By: Austin C. Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stemen
Represented By: Austin C. Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Platz
Represented By: Austin C. Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?