Jacobs et al v. Delta Air Lines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brian Jacobs, Rivka Jacobs, Gabriella Jacobs, Jordana Jacobs and E.J.
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc. and Jane Doe
Case Number: 2:2023cv10088
Filed: January 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER for the Exchange of Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/27/2023, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 4/3/2024 Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (Refer to image for additional dates) (AChu)
February 3, 2023 Filing 9 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Torpey, Scott)
February 3, 2023 Filing 8 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Radner, Solomon)
February 3, 2023 Filing 7 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Radner, Solomon)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Requiring Parties to Submit a Joint Discovery Plan. (Response due by 2/3/2023) Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
January 17, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Torpey, Scott)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of RECUSAL and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds to District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (SSch)
January 12, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy James O'Connell on behalf of Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (O'Connell, Timothy)
January 12, 2023 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Torpey, Scott)
January 12, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Delta Air Lines, Inc. from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 22-015202-CZ. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9193583 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint) (Torpey, Scott)
January 12, 2023 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs et al v. Delta Air Lines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Jacobs
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rivka Jacobs
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriella Jacobs
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordana Jacobs
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.J.
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy James O'Connell
Represented By: Scott R. Torpey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?