Ward v. Alcar Recovery, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Amika Ward
Defendant: Alcar Recovery, LLC, Roe Recovery and John Doe
Case Number: 2:2023cv10157
Filed: January 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Curtis Ivy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Alcar Recovery, LLC served on 3/7/2023, answer due 3/28/2023. (Lyngklip, Ian)
February 7, 2023 Filing 5 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #4 MOTION FOR LIMITED DISCOVERY TO IDENTIFY, NAME, AND SERVE ANONYMOUS DEFENDANTS (AChu)
January 23, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION FOR LIMITED DISCOVERY TO IDENTIFY, NAME, AND SERVE ANONYMOUS DEFENDANTS by Amika Ward. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Counsel) (Lyngklip, Ian)
January 20, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Roe Recovery* (DAll)
January 20, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Alcar Recovery, LLC* (DAll)
January 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Amika Ward against Alcar Recovery, LLC, John Doe #1, John Doe #2, Roe Recovery with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9204282 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Genessee - County Where Action Arose: Genessee - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Lyngklip, Ian)
January 20, 2023 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Alcar Recovery, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amika Ward
Represented By: Ian Bryce Lyngklip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcar Recovery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe Recovery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?