Amjad et al v. Blinken et al
Petitioner: Leyla Amjad and Hamidreza Shahraki
Respondent: Antony Blinken, U.S. Department of State, Ian Brownlee and Julie Stufft
Case Number: 2:2023cv10215
Filed: January 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Leyla Amjad, Hamidreza Shahraki (Al-Akhras, Jana)
March 8, 2023 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of Antony Blinken served on 2/6/2023, answer due 4/7/2023; Ian Brownlee served on 2/6/2023, answer due 4/7/2023; Julie Stufft served on 2/6/2023, answer due 4/7/2023; U.S. Department of State served on 2/6/2023, answer due 4/7/2023. (Al-Akhras, Jana)
March 3, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany D. Parling on behalf of All Defendants. (Parling, Brittany)
January 30, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (KBro)
January 30, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (KBro)
January 27, 2023 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by Leyla Amjad, Hamidreza Shahraki against Antony Blinken, Ian Brownlee, Julie Stufft, U.S. Department of State. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9214737 - Fee: 402 dollars. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Al-Akhras, Jana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amjad et al v. Blinken et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leyla Amjad
Represented By: Jana Al-Akhras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hamidreza Shahraki
Represented By: Jana Al-Akhras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Antony Blinken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ian Brownlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Julie Stufft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?