Prepared Food Photos, Inc. v. Yono Alpine Foods, Inc.
Plaintiff: Prepared Food Photos, Inc. and Adlife Marketing & Communications Co., Inc.
Defendant: Yono Alpine Foods, Inc. Doing business as Alpine Marketplace
Case Number: 2:2023cv10559
Filed: March 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2023 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Yono Alpine Foods, Inc. . (DeSouza, Daniel)
April 7, 2023 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Magy Shenouda appearing on behalf of Prepared Food Photos, Inc. (Shenouda, Magy)
April 7, 2023 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Charles E. Murphy appearing on behalf of Prepared Food Photos, Inc. (Murphy, Charles)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to Secure Local Counsel - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
March 9, 2023 Filing 5 Copyright Report Sent To Washington (DeSouza, Daniel)
March 9, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Yono Alpine Foods, Inc.* (DPer)
March 9, 2023 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Prepared Food Photos, Inc. (DeSouza, Daniel)
March 9, 2023 Filing 2 [FILING ERROR: DOCUMENT HAS FILLABLE FIELDS] Copyright Report Sent To Washington (DeSouza, Daniel) Modified on 3/9/2023 (DPer).
March 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Prepared Food Photos, Inc. against Yono Alpine Foods, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9265873 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Broward - County Where Action Arose: Genesee - County of 1st Defendant: Genesee. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (DeSouza, Daniel)
March 9, 2023 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
March 9, 2023 NOTICE of error directed to Daniel DeSouza re #2 Patent/Copyright/Trademark Report. Document is not flattened and contains fillable fields. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prepared Food Photos, Inc. v. Yono Alpine Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prepared Food Photos, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel DeSouza
Represented By: Charles E. Murphy
Represented By: Magy Shenouda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adlife Marketing & Communications Co., Inc.
Represented By: Daniel DeSouza
Represented By: Charles E. Murphy
Represented By: Magy Shenouda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yono Alpine Foods, Inc. Doing business as Alpine Marketplace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?