BMW of North America, LLC v. Scramoge Technology Limited
Plaintiff: BMW of North America, LLC
Defendant: Scramoge Technology Limited
Case Number: 2:2023cv10561
Filed: March 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A Drain
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2023 Filing 6 Patent Report Sent To Washington (Lavenue, Lionel)
April 3, 2023 Filing 5 [STRICKEN] Patent Report Sent To Washington (Lavenue, Lionel) Modified on 4/3/2023 (TTho).
April 3, 2023 NOTICE of Error directed to: Lionel M. Lavenue re #5 Patent/Copyright/Trademark Report. Document is not flattened and contains fillable fields. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (TTho)
March 14, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Lionel M. Lavenue appearing on behalf of BMW of North America, LLC (Lavenue, Lionel)
March 12, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Scramoge Technology Limited* (LGra)
March 12, 2023 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
March 10, 2023 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by BMW of North America, LLC (McKnight, Megan)
March 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by BMW of North America, LLC against Scramoge Technology Limited with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9266713 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of Michigan - County Where Action Arose: Wayne County - County of 1st Defendant: Out of Country. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): U.S.D.C. - Eastern District of Texas, Case No 2:22-cv-00472, Judge Judge Rodney Gilstrap] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1- Complaint against BMW AG (ED Texas), #3 Exhibit 2- United States Patent No. 10,546,685 to Park, #4 Exhibit 3- United States Patent No. 10,193,392 to Bae, #5 Exhibit 4 - United States Patent No. 7,825,537 to Freer, #6 Exhibit 5- United States Patent No. 7,825,537 to Freer United States Patent No. 10,243,400 to Park) (McKnight, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMW of North America, LLC v. Scramoge Technology Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMW of North America, LLC
Represented By: Megan Piper McKnight
Represented By: Lionel M. Lavenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scramoge Technology Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?