Wilson v. Joseph et al
Plaintiff: Dwayne Edmond Wilson
Defendant: Joseph, Negent, Keiser, Furqueron, Garrow, Biggs, Florek, Nagy, Young and Landfair
Case Number: 2:2023cv10863
Filed: April 14, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Curtis Ivy
Referring Judge: Victoria A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Limited Appearance by Austin C. Raines on behalf of Biggs, Furqueron, Garrow, Joseph, Keiser, Landfair, Nagy, Negent, Young for the purposes of the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program. (Raines, Austin)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER STAYING CASE and Referral to the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Order Staying Case on Dwayne Edmond Wilson 258602 ALGER MAXIMUM CORRECTIONAL FACILITY N6141 INDUSTRIAL PARK DRIVE MUNISING, MI 49862 (LVer)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Mediation Program (TTho)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Docket Sheet from Michigan Western; Case Number 1:23-cv-00358.
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the Western District of Michigan. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (VLun)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Eastern District of Michigan; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln) [Transferred from miwd on 4/14/2023.]
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $30.59 when funds are available; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln) [Transferred from miwd on 4/14/2023.]
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 TRANSFERREDCOMPLAINT with magistrate referral against All Defendants filed by Dwayne Edmund Wilson #258602 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (ns) [Transferred from Michigan Western; Case Number 1:23-cv-00358.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Joseph et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Edmond Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph
Represented By: Austin C. Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Negent
Represented By: Austin C. Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keiser
Represented By: Austin C. Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Furqueron
Represented By: Austin C. Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrow
Represented By: Austin C. Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biggs
Represented By: Austin C. Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nagy
Represented By: Austin C. Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young
Represented By: Austin C. Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landfair
Represented By: Austin C. Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?