Nagi v. Hamtramck Public Schools et al
Plaintiff: Nabil Nagi
Defendant: School District of the City of Hamtramck Public Schools, Jaleelah Hassan Ahmed, Salah Hadwan, Jihan Aiyash, Daz'shavon Hall and Hamtramck Public Schools
Case Number: 2:2023cv11194
Filed: May 19, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Jonathan JC Grey
2 Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Sofia Kozak on behalf of Hamtramck Public Schools. (Kozak, Anna)
July 10, 2023 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Hamtramck Public Schools waiver sent on 6/26/2023, answer due 8/25/2023. (Sashital, Gouri)
July 10, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Gouri G. Sashital on behalf of Hamtramck Public Schools. (Sashital, Gouri)
June 26, 2023 Text-Only Order of reassignment from District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III to District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey pursuant to Administrative Order 23-AO-022. Except in cases previously referred to a magistrate judge, existing scheduling orders and motion hearing dates are suspended. Status conferences will be scheduled in the near future for general civil cases. Cases referred to a magistrate judge will keep all previously scheduled dates. (SSch)
May 22, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Hamtramck Public Schools* (DAll)
May 22, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DAll)
May 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Nabil Nagi against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9356159 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Miotke, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nagi v. Hamtramck Public Schools et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nabil Nagi
Represented By: Gary T. Miotke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: School District of the City of Hamtramck Public Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaleelah Hassan Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salah Hadwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jihan Aiyash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daz'shavon Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamtramck Public Schools
Represented By: Anna Sofia Kozak
Represented By: Gouri G. Sashital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?