Dykes-Bey v. Grand Prairie Health Care Services et al
Plaintiff: Robert L. Dykes-Bey
Defendant: Grand Prairie Health Care Services, Wellpath Healthcare and Victoria Janowiecki
Case Number: 2:2023cv11403
Filed: June 13, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Linda V Parker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents for Grand Prairie Health Care Services, Victoria Janowiecki, Wellpath Healthcare. Documents served on 7/11/2023. (TTho)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Correction re #7 Acknowledgment. (LGra)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 [[DOCKETING ERROR - ENTERED IN ERROR CONTAINS INCORRECT SERVICE DATE] ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents for Grand Prairie Health Care Services, Victoria Janowiecki, Wellpath Healthcare. Documents served on 6/26/2023. (NAhm) Modified on 6/28/2023 (LGra).
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing service without prepayment of costs and authorizing the US Marshal to collect costs after service is made. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (SKra)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and Directing Payment of an Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $1.78 and subsequent payments. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (SKra)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (JOwe)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Robert L. Dykes-Bey. (SKra)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 [FILED AS A MOTION]APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Robert L. Dykes-Bey. (SKra)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Robert L. Dykes-Bey against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Cover Sheet) (SKra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dykes-Bey v. Grand Prairie Health Care Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Dykes-Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Prairie Health Care Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath Healthcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Janowiecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?