Valade v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Estate of Gretchen C. Valade
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2024cv10175
Filed: January 23, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Sean F Cox
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7422 IRS: Refund Taxes
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2024 Filing 9 [DOCUMENT IS TITLED: UNOPPOSED REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by United States of America. (Stallings, Mary) Modified on 3/22/2024 (LGra).
March 21, 2024 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mary Stallings appearing on behalf of United States of America (Stallings, Mary)
February 16, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher James Zdarsky on behalf of Estate of Gretchen C. Valade. (Zdarsky, Christopher)
February 16, 2024 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of United States of America served on 2/12/2024, answer due 4/12/2024. (Roberts, Wayne)
January 24, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS RE- Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. [PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY CORRECTED ADDRESS] (NAhm)
January 24, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS RE Issued for *United States of America* (NAhm) [PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY CORRECTED ADDRESS] Modified on 1/24/2024 (NAhm).
January 24, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (DJen)
January 24, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *United States of America* (DJen)
January 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Estate of Gretchen C. Valade against Estate of Gretchen C. Valade with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9633680 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to F) (Roberts, Wayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valade v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Gretchen C. Valade
Represented By: Wayne D. Roberts
Represented By: Christopher James Zdarsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Mary Stallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?