Holliday v. Statebridge Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Eric Scott Holliday, Jr.
Defendant: Statebridge Company, LLC and Orlans, P.C.
Case Number: 2:2024cv10534
Filed: March 1, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Linda V Parker
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1640 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #9 Response to Motion by Eric Scott Holliday, Jr [Submitted Through Pro Se Portal] (NAhm)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Amended Complaint and RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Eric Scott Holliday, Jr. [Parties were not added or terminated from the amended complaint] [Submitted Through Pro Se Portal] (NAhm)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESPONSE to re #3 Request Pl's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Statebridge Company, LLC. (Mitchell, Matthew)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Requiring Response to #5 Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 4/19/2024 Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (KBro)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Referring Matters for Full Pretrial to Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti re #5 Motion to Dismiss,. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge mailed to: Eric Scott Holliday, Jr at 5337 Woodland White Lake, MI 48383 (AFla)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #7 Order Requiring Responsive Pleading on Eric Scott Holliday, Jr at 5337 Woodland White Lake MI 48383. (KBro)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The Court withdraws the Order Referring Pretrial Matters to the Magistrate Judge only as it pertains to Plaintiff's #3 Request for TRO. SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Text-Only Order mailed to: Eric Scott Holliday, Jr at 5337 Woodland White Lake, MI 48383 (AFla)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Statebridge Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit B - First Assignment of Mortgage, #4 Exhibit C- Second Assignment of Mortgage, #5 Exhibit D -Third Assignment of Mortgage, #6 Exhibit E - Response to First Letter, #7 Exhibit F - Response to Second Letter, #8 Exhibit G - Sheriff's Deed on Foreclosure) (Mitchell, Matthew)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (MSyl)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST for temporary restrainig order, permanent injunction and emergency hearing by Eric Scott Holliday, Jr. (DPer)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REGARDING REMOVAL. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Order mailed to: Eric Scott Holliday, Jr at 5337 Woodland White Lake, MI 48383 (AFla)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DJen)
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Statebridge Company, LLC from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2024-205587-CH. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9694543 - Fee: $405 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Mitchell, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holliday v. Statebridge Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Scott Holliday, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Statebridge Company, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlans, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?