Ideal Holdings of Michigan, LLC et al v. The High Consultants, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ideal Holdings of Michigan, LLC and Done Right Properties, LLC
Defendant: The High Consultants, LLC and Marc Steimer
Case Number: 2:2024cv10780
Filed: March 27, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Sean F Cox
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Grace C Ceccolini on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Ceccolini, Grace)
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Summons Issued by Done Right Properties, LLC, Ideal Holdings of Michigan, LLC as to Defendant The High Consultants LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G) (Hubbard, John)
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Summons Issued by Done Right Properties, LLC, Ideal Holdings of Michigan, LLC as to Defendant Marc Steimer (Hubbard, John)
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Marc Steimer. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Marc Steimer. [Submitted through Pro Se Portal] (SSch)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *The High Consultants, LLC* (LGra)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Marc Steimer* (LGra)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric A. Parzianello on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Parzianello, Eric)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Hubbard on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Hubbard, John)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9726910 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Livingston - County Where Action Arose: Livingston - County of 1st Defendant: Denver. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Business Plan Addendum; Pg 50 of Operating Agreement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Term Sheet, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Chelsea Project Slide Deck May 2022, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Pro forma projection, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Updated Pro forma June 2022, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - LOI, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Affidavit of Sellers) (Hubbard, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ideal Holdings of Michigan, LLC et al v. The High Consultants, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ideal Holdings of Michigan, LLC
Represented By: Eric A. Parzianello
Represented By: John A. Hubbard
Represented By: Grace C Ceccolini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Done Right Properties, LLC
Represented By: Eric A. Parzianello
Represented By: John A. Hubbard
Represented By: Grace C Ceccolini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The High Consultants, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Steimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?