United States of America v. Roscoe et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Kale K Roscoe, Jr., Lisa E Roscoe, William T O'Connor, Provident Trust Group, LLC, Chase Mortgage Company, Inc., Macomb County Treasurer and Chase Mortgage Company
Case Number: 2:2024cv10892
Filed: April 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Referring Judge: Linda V Parker
2 Judge: Anthony P Patti
3 Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 6502 IRS:Enforcement of tax liens
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2024 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Chase Mortgage Company served on 5/22/2024, answer due 6/12/2024. (Parke, Kimberly)
May 9, 2024 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. (Parke, Kimberly) Modified on 5/10/2024 (JHea) [Waiver for Provident Trust Group, sent on 4/10/2024].
May 8, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly A. Zappitell on behalf of Macomb County Treasurer. (Zappitell, Molly)
May 8, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank J. Krycia on behalf of Macomb County Treasurer. (Krycia, Frank)
May 7, 2024 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Provident Trust Group, LLC waiver sent on 4/10/2024, answer due 6/10/2024. (Parke, Kimberly)
May 7, 2024 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Kale K Roscoe, Jr waiver sent on 4/10/2024, answer due 6/10/2024. (Parke, Kimberly)
April 25, 2024 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Lisa E Roscoe waiver sent on 4/10/2024, answer due 6/10/2024. (Parke, Kimberly)
April 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Linda V. Parker and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford to District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III and Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (SSch)
April 9, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued for *Lisa E Roscoe* (MSyl)
April 9, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *Kale K Roscoe, Jr* (MSyl)
April 9, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Provident Trust Group, LLC* (MSyl)
April 9, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *William T O'Connor* (MSyl)
April 9, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Macomb County Treasurer* (MSyl)
April 9, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Chase Mortgage Company* (MSyl)
April 9, 2024 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (MSyl)
April 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Eastern District of Michigan, 2:17-cv-10316, Judge Stephen J. Murphy] (Parke, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Roscoe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kimberly R. Parke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kale K Roscoe, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa E Roscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William T O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provident Trust Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Mortgage Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macomb County Treasurer
Represented By: Frank J. Krycia
Represented By: Molly A. Zappitell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?