Operating Engineers Local 324 Pension Fund et al v. Gayanga Co., LLC et al
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local 324 Vacation & Holiday Fund, Operating Engineers Local 324 Defined Contribution Plan, Operating Engineers Local 324 Health Care Plan, Operating Engineers Local 324 Apprenticeship Fund, Operating Engineers Local 324 Pension Fund and Operating Engineers Local 324 Retiree Benefit Fund
Defendant: Gayanga Co., LLC and Brian McKinney, Sr.
Case Number: 2:2024cv12216
Filed: August 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2024 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Gayanga Co., LLC, Brian McKinney, Sr. (Burrell, Aaron)
October 17, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The parties are ordered to review Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 26(f) and Judge Leitmans practice guidelines and FILE a Joint Discovery Plan with the Court in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 26(f)(3), on or before November 18, 2024. The Court will review the plan and determine whether to set a scheduling conference or enter a scheduling order based upon the filed plan. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
October 3, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Myles J. Baker on behalf of Gayanga Co., LLC, Brian McKinney, Sr. (Baker, Myles)
October 3, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron V. Burrell on behalf of Gayanga Co., LLC, Brian McKinney, Sr. (Burrell, Aaron)
October 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Defendants' Time to File an Answer. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
October 2, 2024 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, Extension of Defendants' Time to File Answer by Gayanga Co., LLC, Brian McKinney, Sr (Burrell, Aaron)
September 12, 2024 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Selwocki, David)
August 23, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacquelyne Zolynsky on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Zolynsky, Jacquelyne)
August 23, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Gayanga Co., LLC, Brian McKinney, Sr* (EVra)
August 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9913311 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Selwocki, David)
August 23, 2024 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (EVra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Operating Engineers Local 324 Pension Fund et al v. Gayanga Co., LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local 324 Vacation & Holiday Fund
Represented By: David J. Selwocki
Represented By: Jacquelyne Zolynsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local 324 Defined Contribution Plan
Represented By: David J. Selwocki
Represented By: Jacquelyne Zolynsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local 324 Health Care Plan
Represented By: David J. Selwocki
Represented By: Jacquelyne Zolynsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local 324 Apprenticeship Fund
Represented By: David J. Selwocki
Represented By: Jacquelyne Zolynsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local 324 Pension Fund
Represented By: David J. Selwocki
Represented By: Jacquelyne Zolynsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local 324 Retiree Benefit Fund
Represented By: David J. Selwocki
Represented By: Jacquelyne Zolynsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gayanga Co., LLC
Represented By: Myles J. Baker
Represented By: Aaron V. Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian McKinney, Sr.
Represented By: Myles J. Baker
Represented By: Aaron V. Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?