Singh v. Rardin
Petitioner: Gurkaran Singh
Respondent: Eric Rardin
Case Number: 2:2024cv12281
Filed: September 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Jonathan JC Grey
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2024 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jessica Vartanian Currie appearing on behalf of FCI Milan Warden Eric Rardin (Currie, Jessica)
October 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Requiring Response to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Attached Petition has been electronically served on the Office of the United States Attorney. Response due by 12/9/2024 Reply due by 1/23/2025 Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (Attachments: #1 Peition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus) (MCho)
October 10, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Correction re #6 Order Requiring Responsive Pleading,. (MCho)
October 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 [SEALED - Wrong event selected for document] ORDER Requiring Response to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Attached Petition has been electronically served on the Michigan Attorney General and the Michigan Department of Corrections. Response due by 12/3/2024 Reply due by 1/17/2025 Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus) (MCho) Modified on 10/10/2024 (MCho).
October 1, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Issuance of Show Cause Order by Gurkaran Singh. (TTho)
September 24, 2024 FILING FEE Received in the amount of $5.00 by Gurkaran Singh - Receipt No. 150012185 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (EVra)
September 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Correct Deficiency for Failed to submit either the $5.00 filing fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis.. Correction due by 9/30/2024 Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (MSyl)
September 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Amending Case Caption. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (MSyl)
September 6, 2024 Filing 2 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (LGra)
September 3, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Gurkaran Singh against FCI Milan Warden. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JPar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Rardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gurkaran Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric Rardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?