Brown v. Rardin
Petitioner: Jason C. Brown
Respondent: Eric Rardin
Case Number: 2:2024cv12368
Filed: September 10, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Vartanian Currie on behalf of Eric Rardin. (Currie, Jessica)
November 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Requiring Response to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Attached Petition has been electronically served on the Office of the United States Attorney. Response due by 1/6/2025 Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus) (NAhm)
October 22, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Expedited Summary Judgment by Jason C. Brown. (JPar)
October 8, 2024 Filing 5 Letter re Clarification of Filing from Jason C. Brown (SSch)
October 7, 2024 FILING FEE Received in the amount of 5.00 by Jason C. Brown - Receipt No. 150012388 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (APok)
September 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Correct Deficiency for failed to submit either the $5.00 filing fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Correction due by 10/8/2024 Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (MSyl)
September 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Amending Case Caption. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (MSyl)
September 13, 2024 Filing 2 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (LGra)
September 10, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jason C. Brown against Warden FCI Milan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JPar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Rardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jason C. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric Rardin
Represented By: Jessica Vartanian Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?