Junod v. Rardin
Petitioner: Eric Junod
Respondent: Eric Rardin
Case Number: 2:2024cv12399
Filed: September 12, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Patricia T Morris
Referring Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2024 Filing 9 EXHIBIT re #8 Response to Petition/Request/Application by Eric Rardin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jeremy Cooper with attachments) (Shaw, Erin)
October 31, 2024 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Eric Rardin. (Shaw, Erin)
October 31, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Shaw on behalf of Eric Rardin. (Shaw, Erin)
September 26, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Vartanian Currie on behalf of Eric Rardin. (Currie, Jessica)
September 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Requiring Response to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Attached Petition has been electronically served on the Office of the United States Attorney. Response due by 11/1/2024 Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (Attachments: #1 Petition) (JPar)
September 24, 2024 FILING FEE Received in the amount of 5.00 by Eric Junod - Receipt No. 150012199 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (APok)
September 16, 2024 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (MCho)
September 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Correct Deficiency for Failure to submit IFP application. Correction due by 10/4/2024 Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (JPar)
September 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Amending Case Caption. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (JPar)
September 12, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Eric Junod against E. Rardin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JPar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Junod v. Rardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Junod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric Rardin
Represented By: Jessica Vartanian Currie
Represented By: Erin Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?