Frierson v. Rardin
Petitioner: William Frierson
Respondent: Eric Rardin
Case Number: 2:2024cv12456
Filed: September 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan Sweeney Bean on behalf of Eric Rardin. (Bean, Meghan)
October 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for clarification re #2 Order Amending Case Caption by William Frierson. (TTho)
September 25, 2024 Opinion or Order FILING FEE Received in the amount of 5.00 by William Frierson - Receipt No. 150012240 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (APok)
September 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Vartanian Currie on behalf of Eric Rardin. (Currie, Jessica)
September 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Correction re #3 Order Requiring Responsive Pleading,. (MSyl)
September 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (MCho)
September 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Requiring Response to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Attached Petition has been electronically served on the Office of the United States Attorney. Response due by 11/27/2024 Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus) (MSyl)
September 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 [STRICKEN] ORDER Requiring Response to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Attached Petition has been electronically served on the Michigan Attorney General and the Michigan Department of Corrections. Response due by 10/21/2024 Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (MSyl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2024: #1 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus) (MSyl). Modified on 9/24/2024 (MSyl).
September 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Amending Case Caption. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (MSyl)
September 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by William Frierson against Rardin, Receipt No: Pending in Financial - Fee: $ 5. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MSyl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frierson v. Rardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Frierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric Rardin
Represented By: Meghan Sweeney Bean
Represented By: Jessica Vartanian Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?