Antoine v. Rardin
Petitioner: Amanze Antoine
Respondent: Eric Rardin
Case Number: 2:2024cv12462
Filed: September 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Referring Judge: Robert J White
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER from Amanze Antoine regarding payment of filing fee. (TTho)
September 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Correct Deficiency for Failure to submit IFP application. Correction due by 10/18/2024 Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (JPar)
September 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Amending Case Caption. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (JPar)
September 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (LGra)
September 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Amanze Antoine against E. Rardin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JPar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antoine v. Rardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric Rardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Amanze Antoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?